**What is Vedic Mathematics?**

Vedic Maths is the present given to us from past by the renowned scholars of India. It is an uncontemporary form of mathematics which was rediscovered by Shri Bharti Kishna Tirthaji somewhere between the years 1911 and 1918 from the Vedas. It comprises of multitudes of techniques to make solving maths more effective and efficient. Using this method, long and tiring calculations suddenly turns easy. We are able to calculate the answer with precision in minute of time. This does not only help in solving arithmetic but also algebra, geometry, trigonometry, calculus and applied mathematics. Vedic Maths techniques are so simple that all the cumbersome questions can be solved using mental math.

**How do you calculate fast?**

If we calculate maths using the usual step by step method, problems often seem to be complex and also end up being time consuming. Therefore, to calculate fast, it is advisable to do Vedic Maths and learn the different techniques.

**What are some simple Vedic Mathematics tricks
and techniques?**

### How to square a number whose last digit is 5

This vedic maths formula is pretty simple by which you can square any 2-digit number which has 5 in its one’s place.

First,
multiply the 1^{st}
digit on the left-hand side with 1 and then, write 25 at the end.

That’s trick 1 for you. You still didn’t get it. See the example below: –

**For
example:****
(75) ² =?**

**Step
1**:75 x 75 = …….25
(at the end)

**Step
2*** :*7x (7+1) =
7 x 8 = 56

Therefore,
the answer is **5625.**

### Multiplication of a number with 5

Memorizing 5 table is every easy. But as the smaller numbers turn to larger numbers, calculation turns complex. This vedic maths technique helps you to solve this problem.

Here, you have to take any number and divide it by 2. If your result is a whole number, then add 0 (zero digit) at the end of the number. If it is not a whole number, then add 5 at the end and ignore whatever remainder you have got.

**For
example:** 8426 x
5 =?

**Step
1**: 8426 / 2 = 4213

**Step
2:** It is a
whole number, so add 0

The
answer will be 8426 x 5 = **42130**

Let’s try another: 7337 x 5

**Step
1:**3773
/ 2 = 3668.5

**Step
2:** This is a
fractional number, so we will ignore remainder and add 5 at the end.

The
answer will be 7337 x 5 = **36685**

### How to subtract a number from 1000, 10000, 100000 and so on.

This maths technique is very useful when you want accurate subtracted results from 1000, 10000, 100000 and so on……

There is only one formula – Subtract all the digits from 9 and last digit from 10.

**For
example:** 1000 –
876 =?

We simply subtract each figure in 876 from 9 and the last figure from 10.

* Step
1.* 9 – 8
= 1

* Step
2.* 9 – 7
= 2

* Step
3.* 10 –
6 = 4

So, the answer is 1000 – 473 = 124

### How to Multiply any 2-digit numbers between 11 to 19

This trick is of great help if you are just like me and cannot remember the tables after 10. Once practiced for adequate amount of times, you can calculate the results very fast. There are in total 4 steps to solve through this type of trick.

**Step
1:** Add
the unit digit of smaller number to the larger number.

**Step
2****:**
Multiply the sum result by 10.

**Step
3:** Multiply
both number’s unit digit.

**Step
4:** Add
both the numbers (which were involved in step 1 & step 2).

For example: Take 2 numbers like 12 and 15.

*Step
1.* 15 + 2 =17

*Step
2*. 17*10 = 170.

*Step
3*. 2*5 = 10

*Step
4.* Add the two
numbers, 170+10 and the answer is **180**

- Division of a large number by 5

This technique quickly gives the answer after division of any large number by 5. There are only two steps which you need to follow. First, being multiplication of number by 2 and second being removal of digit after decimal point.

**For
example*** :*
415 / 5 =?

Step
1. 415 * 2 =
207.5

Step 2. Move
the decimal: 207.5 or just 207

- How to Multiply any two-digit number with 11

Using this mental math trick, multiplication can be done swiftly.

To
multiply 45 and 11, let us imagine that there is a gap between
45

**Step 1:** Put
an imaginary space in between: 45*11= 4_5

**Step
2:** Just add 4
and 5 and put the result in the imaginary space

So, the answer
is: 45 * 11 = **495**

Let’s try another number….

36
* 11 = 3 (3+6) 9 = **396**

- Multiplication of any large number by 12

In order to multiply any no. by 12 we need to just double the last digit of the number and then, double each digit and add it to its neighboring number.

**For
example:** 3243 * 12
=?

Let’s break it into simple steps:

**Step
1.** 3243 * 12
= _____6 (Double of Last Digit 3= 6 )

**Step
2.** 3243 * 12
= ____16 (Now Double 4= 8, and add it to 3, 8+3=11, 1 will get
carry over)

**Step
3.** 3243 *
12= ___916 (Now Double 2=4, and add it to 4 with carry,
4+4+1=9)

**Step
4.** 3243* 12=
_8916 (Now Double 3=6, and add it to 2, 6+2=8)

**Step
5.** 3243 *
12= 38916

So your final answer of 3243 *
12 = **38916**

- Multiplication of any 3-digit numbers

Take any two
numbers like 204 and 206

* Step 1. *Now subtract
the number at unit place.

204-4=200

206-6=200

*Now select any no. and add the unit digit of another no.*

**Step 2.**204+6=210

*Now multiply, 210×200 = 42000*

**Step 3.***Now multiply the unit digits of both numbers, 4×6=24*

**Step 4.***Add, 42000+24 = 42024*

**Step 5.**The product of
the numbers 204 and 206 is **42024**

**Conversion of kilograms to pounds **

Let take an
example: Convert 142 Kg to pound.

* Step 1.* Multiply
Kg value by 2

142X2= 284

*Divide the previous one by 10*

**Step 2.**284/10=28.4

*Add both the number*

**Step 3.**284+ 28.4=

**312.4 pounds**

**How to calculate square of any number **

Calculating squares can be very easy if you are doing it using Vedic maths.

* Step 1.
*Choose a base nearer to the no. whose sq. is to be found.

* Step
2.* Find the difference of the no. from its base.

* Step 3.* Add
the difference with the no.

* Step
4.* Multiply the result with the base.

* Step 5.* Add
the product of the sq. of the difference with the result of the above
point.

Let’s take an example to understand this: (88) ² =?

*Step 1.* Choose
100 as base

*Step
2.* Difference =88-100 = -12

*Step 3*. Number
+ difference = 99 + (-12) = 87

*Step
4** .* Multiplying result with base = 87*100 =
8700

*Step 5.* Adding
result with square of difference= 8700 + (-12)² = **8844**

**What is the importance of Vedic maths?**

There are various reasons why Vedic mathematics is so important.

- Vedic Maths is very simple, systematic and far more effective than the everyday maths methods. This approach is based on pattern recognition and hence easy to learn.
- Students who practice this methodology let go of their maths phobia as this maths has a potential to help students to forgo anxiety.
- Speed and accuracy level increases and also at the same time, there are fast and better methods of re checking the calculations.
- It makes maths enjoyable and also helps in development of brain by increasing concentration level.